CA SB1181 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 542, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 542, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42951, 42953, 42954, 42955, 42956, 42961.5, 42962, 42962.5, 42963, 42964, 42966, and 42967 of, and to add Section 42885.7 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to tires.
Title
Waste and used tires.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1181 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Alvarez (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1181 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1181 Hueso (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1181 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1181 Hueso (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 542, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5328.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3840.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3787.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3521.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3458.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26 in TRANS. pending receipt. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and TRANS. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42885.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42953 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42954 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42955 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42956 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42961.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42962 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42962.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42963 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42964 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42966 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42967 | Amended Code | Citation Text |