CA SB1181 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - April 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 8585.8 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency services: certified community conservation corps.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateApril 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8585.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback