CA SB118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 19829.9848, 20825.1, 22871.3, 22879, and 22944.5 of, and to add Sections 19829.9849, 19829.9850, 20683.75, 20683.8, 20683.81, 20683.81.1, 20683.81.2, 20683.82, 20683.83, 20683.9, 20683.91, 20825.15, and 22874.9 to, the Government Code, relating to state employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State employment: State Bargaining Units 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 7, 11, 13, 14, 15, 17, 20, and 21.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB118 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-09-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-08-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 677.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code19829.9848Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19829.9849New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code19829.9850New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20683.75New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20683.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20683.81New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20683.81.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20683.81.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20683.82New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20683.83New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20683.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20683.91New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20825.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20825.15New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code22871.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22874.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code22879Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22944.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback