CA SB118 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 144 and 26051.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Cannabis: licenses: criminal records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB118 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB118 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 23. Noes 1.) (March 5). |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 9.) (September 14). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | September 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-09-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 2825.) |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1041.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |