CA SB1179 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R.
Pending: Assembly Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R.
Pending: Assembly Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 999.5 and 999.9 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: Disabled Veteran Business Enterprise Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1179 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4454.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4305.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | May 7 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4790.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4605.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and V.A. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 999.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 999.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |