CA SB1179 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 592, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 592, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9002 of, and to add Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 9069.10) to Part 4 of Division 8 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to cemeteries.
Title
Public cemetery districts: interment rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-18 - Senate - Special Consent SB1179 Vidak (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1179 Vidak Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1179 Vidak (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1179 Vidak Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1179 Vidak (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 592, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5141.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5779.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. GOV. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3850.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3611.) (April 19). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | April 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 9002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 9069.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |