CA SB1178 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 999 of, and to add Section 999.4 to, the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
California Disabled Veteran Business Enterprise Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and G.O. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 999 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 999.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1178 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1178 |