CA SB1177 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 26835, 27535, 27540, and 27590 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms: transfers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1177 Portantino (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-06-14AssemblyJune 20 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4408.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4305.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4817.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4622.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on ED. and L. & I.R.
2018-03-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code45165.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code45166Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code26835Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code27535Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code27540Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code27590Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback