CA SB1177 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Set for hearing April 25.
Pending: Senate Labor and Industrial Relations Committee
Hearing: Apr 25 @ 9:30 am in Rose Ann Vuich Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 45165.5 of the Education Code, relating to classified employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Classified employees: Classified School Employees Summer Furlough Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on ED. and L. & I.R.
2018-03-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code45165.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code45166Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback