CA SB1175 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - July 23 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Hearing: Jul 23 @ 1:00 pm in State Capitol, Assembly Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2120 of, and to add Section 2351 to, the Fish and Game Code, and to amend Section 597.3 of the Penal Code, relating to animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animals: prohibitions on importation and possession of wild animals: live animal markets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1175 Stern (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-09AssemblyJuly 23 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2020-06-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-04SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3596.) (May 26).
2020-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 26.
2020-05-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2020-05-12SenateReferral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
2020-03-16SenateMarch 24 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-10SenateSet for hearing March 24.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
2020-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code2120Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code2351New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code597.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback