CA SB1173 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4041 of the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: annual notices: time-share plan interests.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Assembly - SB 1173 Vidak Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1173 Vidak (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1173 Vidak (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5978.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5088.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4997.) (May 8). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | April 17 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | April 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4418.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 4041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |