CA SB1172 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 720, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 720, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 22.2.7 (commencing with Section 22588) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Student Test Taker Privacy Protection Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1172 Pan Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1172 Pan Senate Third Reading By Cunningham (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1172 Pan (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1172 Pan Senate Third Reading By Cunningham (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1172 Pan (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 720, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5084.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 6001.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (August 3). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 28). |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3906.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3786.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3326.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22588 | New Code | See Bill Text |