CA SB1172 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 790, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1245.210 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 11005, 11005.2, 13332.11, 13332.12, 15853, and 15855 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 10106 and 10107 of the Public Contract Code, and to amend Section 408 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to high-speed rail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High-Speed Rail Authority: property acquisition: capital outlays: public contracts: county assessor’s records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1172 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1172 Beall Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA (Y: 46 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1172 Beall (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 790, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 6128.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 6963.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-12SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4640.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-03-22SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-03-22SenateFrom consent calendar on motion of Senator Beall.
2018-03-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-03-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4418.) (March 20).
2018-03-13SenateSet for hearing March 20.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback