CA SB1169 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 280, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 49430, 49430.5, 49430.7, 49431, 49431.2, 49431.5, 49431.7, and 49432 of the Education Code, relating to pupil nutrition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil nutrition: competitive food service and standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-18 - Senate - Special Consent SB1169 McGuire (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1169 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent # SB1169 McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 280, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-09 Approved by the Governor.
2016-08-24SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2016-08-18SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5141.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2016-08-16SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2016-08-11SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2016-08-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5779.) Ordered to the Senate.
2016-08-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2016-08-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
2016-06-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22).
2016-06-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2016-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2016-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4148.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2016-05-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2016-05-31SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (May 27).
2016-05-20SenateSet for hearing May 27.
2016-04-18SenateApril 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2016-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2016-04-07SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3332.) (March 30).
2016-03-11SenateSet for hearing March 30.
2016-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2016-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2016-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1169&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_bill_20160218_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_bill_20160407_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_bill_20160531_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_bill_20160630_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_bill_20160819_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_bill_20160909_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_vote_20160330_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_vote_20160418_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_vote_20160527_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_vote_20160602_0153PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_vote_20160622_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_vote_20160803_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_vote_20160811_0957AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1169_vote_20160818_0316PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback