CA SB1165 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11831.9 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 4097 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to substance abuse and mental health services.
Title
Substance abuse and mental health services: advertisement and marketing.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SB 1165 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1165 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1165 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5756.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3476.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3204.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11831.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4097 | Amended Code | Citation Text |