CA SB1164 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - June 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - June 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 74.9 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: new construction exclusion: accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1164 Newman (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Assembly | June 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 4132.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3974.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3564.) (April 10). |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 74.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |