CA SB1164 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 695, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 23363.1, 23502, 23504, 23771, 25173, 25503.3, 25503.5, 25503.56, and 25503.9 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Craft distillers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1164 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1164 Skinner Senate Third Reading By DALY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1164 Skinner et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 695, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6060.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6757.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Rubio.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-17SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5088.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4785.) (April 24).
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code23363.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code23502Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code23504Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code23508Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code23509New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code23510New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code23771Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code23771.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25173Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.26Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.27Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.31Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.34Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.39Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.40.Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.42Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.56Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.85Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25506Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25507Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25509Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25600.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25600.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25600.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25633Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback