CA SB1161 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 929, 929.1, and 929.3 of, and to add Sections 929.03 and 929.25 to, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Residential property insurance: reporting requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 929 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 929.03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 929.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 929.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 929.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1161 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1161 |