CA SB1161 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 11.8 (commencing with Section 14190) to Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to rural crime, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Inland Empire Rural Crime Prevention Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Set for hearing August 16. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | August 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-04 | Senate | Set for hearing August 6. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4929.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | April 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 21608.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 14190 | New Code | See Bill Text |