CA SB1160 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 868, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 868, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 138.4, 138.6, 4610.5, 4610.6, 4903.05, 4903.8, 5307.27, 5710, 5811, and 6409 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 4610 of, and to add Section 4615 to, the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1160 Mendoza Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1160 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By DALY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1160 Mendoza (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1160 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By DALY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1160 Mendoza (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 868, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5549.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5607.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 5558.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6477.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 25). |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4045.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4004.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3520.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 138.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 138.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3710.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 4604.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 4610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 4610.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 4610.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 4903.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 4903.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 5307.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 5710 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 5811 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 6409 | Amended Code | Citation Text |