CA SB1155 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal Section 116.550 of the Code of Civil Procedure and to amend Section 68560.5 of the Government Code, relating to courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court interpreters: small claims proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1155 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1155 Hueso Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1155 Hueso (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 4.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-15AssemblyAugust 15 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-19AssemblyJune 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4336.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-10SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4816.) (April 24).
2018-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure116.550Amended CodeCitation Text
Evidence Code756.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code68560.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback