CA SB1153 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 38561.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
Greenhouse gases: scoping plan: biomethane.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3643.) (April 20). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3393.) (April 5). |
2016-03-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38561.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 784.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |