CA SB1152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 981, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 1262.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital patient discharge process: homeless patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1152 Hernandez et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1152 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 48 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1152 Hernandez (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 981, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-05SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5864.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 6665.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 15).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (June 26).
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 4394.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-24SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-24SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-09SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 4746.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1262.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1262.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1262.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code127355Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback