CA SB1151 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 8588.4 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Emergency services: feasibility study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3493.) (April 12). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8574.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8588.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |