CA SB1148 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 203, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2924f and 2924 of the Civil Code, relating to civil law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mortgages and deeds of trust: foreclosure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1148 Jones Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1148 Jones Senate Third Reading By Ramos (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1148 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 203, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-31SenateOrdered to unfinished business.
2020-08-31SenateFrom special consent calendar on motion of Senator Grove.
2020-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2020-08-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
2020-07-27AssemblyJuly 30 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-09AssemblyJuly 22 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3681.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2020-05-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3584.) (May 22).
2020-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code2924Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback