CA SB1147 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 25271 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous materials.
Title
Hazardous materials: aboveground storage tanks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1147 Galgiani (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4145.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3765.) (May 4). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3643.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | April 6 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25270.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25271 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.210 | New Code | See Bill Text |