CA SB1146 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 66290.1 and 66290.2 to the Education Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination: postsecondary education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 1)SB1 146 Lar a Con (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1146 Lara Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1146 Lara (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1146 Lara Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1146 Lara (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5532.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 6125.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 11). |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | June 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 21). |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD. |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 3957.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3888.) (May 16). |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | May 2 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3611.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3417.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66271 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66290.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 66290.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 66290.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 66292.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 66292.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8499.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11135.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |