CA SB1145 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 38560.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to climate change.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: greenhouse gas emissions: dashboard.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] |
Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1145 Laird Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent SB1145 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent SB1145 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5938.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3986.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3785.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3239.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38560.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |