CA SB1144 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 20 (commencing with Section 14700) to Division 7 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water efficiency and quality assessment reports: state buildings and public school buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1144 Wiener Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1144 Wiener Senate Third Reading By McCarty (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1144 Wiener (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1144 Wiener Senate Third Reading By McCarty (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1144 Wiener (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5083.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 6029.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-08-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 1 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)). |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and ED. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 3887.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3785.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3539.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 3324.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referral to Com. on E.Q. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O., ED., and E.Q. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 14700 | New Code | See Bill Text |