CA SB1144 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 897, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 897, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19871.3 of the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Enhanced industrial disability leave: State Bargaining Unit 8.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1144 Dodd Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1144 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1144 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 897, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6595.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4350.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4304.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | May 7 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4789.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in P.E. & R. pending receipt. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19871.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42400.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42402.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42405.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |