CA SB114 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 248.6 and 248.7 to the Labor Code, relating to employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Employment: COVID-19: supplemental paid sick leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Assembly - SB 114 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB114 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB114 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB114 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB114 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-02-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-02-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. | |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 2877.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 8. Page 3496.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 3480.) |
2022-02-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 273.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 248.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 248.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |