CA SB1139 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 5007.6, 6401, 6401.5, and 6401.8 to the Penal Code, relating to prisons.
Title
Prisons: visitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1139 Kamlager Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1139 Kamlager Senate Third Reading By BONTA, M (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1139 Kamlager (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1139 Kamlager Senate Third Reading By BONTA, M (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1139 Kamlager (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 5305.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (August 11). |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | June 22 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 3887.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3785.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3256.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 5007.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 6401 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 6401.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 6401.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |