CA SB1137 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 365, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 365, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4.6 (commencing with Section 3280) to Chapter 1 of Division 3 of the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas: operations: location restrictions: notice of intention: health protection zone: sensitive receptors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1137 Gonzalez et al. Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1137 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By BRYAN (Y: 46 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1137 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Bryan Amendment Set #1 (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1137 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1137 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By BRYAN (Y: 46 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1137 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Bryan Amendment Set #1 (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1137 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 365, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-02 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 5400.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (August 29). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-08-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Stone. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | June 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3672.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3440.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3280 | New Code | See Bill Text |