CA SB1137 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 851.86, 851.91, 1473, 1485.55, 4903, and 4904 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Habeas corpus: factual innocence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1473 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1485.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4903 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4904 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 851.86 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 851.91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1137 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1137 |