CA SB1137 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 414, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 714 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans: professional licensing benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1137 Vidak Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1137 Vidak Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1137 Vidak (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 414, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-14 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-21SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5565.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6312.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-05-31AssemblyReferred to Coms. on V.A. and B. & P.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4212.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4697.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4629.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-04-09SenateApril 16 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-07SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Coms. on V.A. and B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Military and Veterans Code714New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback