CA SB1134 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 9.7 (commencing with Section 4450) to Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 11833 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to substance use disorders.
Title
Substance use disorder counselors: Allied Behavioral Health Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Melendez [R] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] | Asm. Randy Voepel [R] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1134 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HUM. S. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3672.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3544.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3325.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HOUSING. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4450 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11833 | Amended Code | Citation Text |