CA SB1134 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-01 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-01 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 730 of, and to add Section 602.05 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Wards: probation.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 602.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 730 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1134 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1134 |