CA SB1133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 231 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to juries.
Title
Peremptory challenges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1133 Jackson (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 3793.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3569.) (May 20). |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 231 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |