CA SB1133 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 355, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 13249 to the Water Code, relating to water quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water quality control plans: funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1133 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1133 Portantino Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1133 Portantino (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 355, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-24SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-20SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5426.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6311.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07AssemblyJune 12 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-05-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-10SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5009.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-24SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4720.) (April 18).
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-03-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code13249New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback