CA SB1130 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-13 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-13 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 67821 of the Government Code, relating to military base reuse.
Title
Military base reuse authority: board of directors: ex officio members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1130 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1130 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3671.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (May 4). |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 67821 | Amended Code | Citation Text |