CA SB1130 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 896, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 16180, 16181, 16182, 16183, 16184, 16186, and 16192 of, and to repeal Article 4 (commencing with Section 16210) of Chapter 5 of Part 1 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, and to amend Sections 2514, 20503, 20505, 20583, 20585, 20586, 20640.2, and 20641 of, to add Section 20639.13 to, and to add Chapter 3.3 (commencing with Section 20639) to Part 10.5 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to manufactured homes, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax postponement: residential dwelling: manufactured homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1130 Leyva et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1130 Leyva Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1130 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 896, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6115.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-30SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 6069.)
2018-08-30SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-08-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6800.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4453.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4304.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-30SenateApril 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4623.) (April 11).
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-03-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code16180Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16180.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code16181Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16182Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16183Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16184Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16186Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16192Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16210Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16211.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20503Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20505Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20583Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20585Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20586Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20639.13New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20640.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20641Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code2514Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback