CA SB1126 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 895, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 895, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 33220 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 2 of Chapter 452 of the Statutes of 2017, relating to the Los Angeles River and tributaries, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Upper Los Angeles River and Tributaries Working Group: river ranger program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1126 Portantino et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1126 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By RIVAS (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1126 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1126 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By RIVAS (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1126 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 895, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5873.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6594.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4453.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4304.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | April 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4698.) (April 16). |
2018-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 33220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |