CA SB1124 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - March 31 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - March 31 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3017 of, and to add Section 3017.5 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: vote by mail ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 3017 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3017.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1124 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1124 |