CA SB1121 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1798.100, 1798.105, 1798.110, 1798.115, 1798.120, 1798.125, 1798.130, 1798.135, 1798.140, 1798.145, 1798.150, 1798.155, 1798.185, 1798.192, 1798.196, and 1798.198 of, and to add Section 1798.199 to, the Civil Code, relating to personal information, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Consumer Privacy Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1121 Dodd Third Reading Urgency (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1121 Dodd et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1121 Dodd Senate Third Reading Amend By CHAU Set #1 (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1121 Dodd (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.)
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-08-31SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 31).
2018-08-31AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-29AssemblyAugust 29 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-28AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-08-24AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-24AssemblyAssembly Rule 69 suspended.
2018-08-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-07-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-11AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4395.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4304.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4814.) (April 24).
2018-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-10SenateMay 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-10SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
2018-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1798.100Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.105Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.110Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.115Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.120Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.125Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.130Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.135Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.140Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.145Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.150Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.155Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.185Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.192Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.196Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.198Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.199New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code1798.80Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.81Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.81.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.83Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.84Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback