CA SB1121 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3021 to the Penal Code, relating to inmates.
Title
Inmates: assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1121 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1121 Hancock Senate Third Reading By AMMIANO (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1121 Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1121 Hancock Senate Third Reading By AMMIANO (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1121 Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-27 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-22 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4686.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-21 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-20 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 6016.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time and amended. (Page 5942.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8). | |
2012-06-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3651.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-25 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3591.) (May 24). | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 30. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3208.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-03-30 | Set for hearing April 17. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-02-21 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2012-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3021 | New Code | See Bill Text |