CA SB112 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 128740 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 129380) of Part 6 of Division 107 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Distressed Hospital Loan Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB112 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 1392.) |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 489.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 357.) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 128740 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 129380 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |