CA SB112 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 23320 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 12815, 16418.8, 19822.3, 20397, and 100002 of, and to repeal Section 100006 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 11495 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 1019.2 of, and to add Section 1019.4 to, the Labor Code, to amend Sections 6126, 6126.2, 6126.3, 6126.5, and 6133 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 27150.2, 27151, and 40610 of the Vehicle Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB112 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - SB 112 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB112 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-09-13SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2923.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-12SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 3464.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-12AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2019-09-12AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-12AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-09-12AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2019-09-09AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-09-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 675.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code23320Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100002Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100006Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code12815Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16418.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19822.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20397Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11495Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1019.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1019.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code6126Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6126.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6126.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6126.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6133Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code27150.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code27151Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code40610Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback