CA SB1119 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1001.6 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public utilities: gas corporations: gas plants: new construction or substantial modification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 3509.) (April 26). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 1001.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |