CA SB1119 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 75230 of the Public Resources Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low Carbon Transit Operations Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1119 Newman (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-05-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-10SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5006.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4720.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4606.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
2018-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code75230Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback