CA SB1115 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on AGRI.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on AGRI.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9221, 9231, and 9269 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 9205 and 9212 of, and to add Sections 9204.5, 9205.5, 9205.7, 9213, and 9253 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to animals, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Commercial blood banks for animals: animal blood donors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1115 Wilk et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3818.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3769.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3533.) (May 13). |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Coms. on JUD., and B., P. & E.D. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2020-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on AGRI., JUD., and B., P. & E.D. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 9205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 9212 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 9221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 9231 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 9269 | Amended Code | Citation Text |